CO SJR015 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-39)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning recognition of the contributions of Latina and Latino veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognition Of Latina And Latino Veterans

Sponsors

Sen. Kevin Priola [R]Sen. Robert Rodriguez [D]Rep. Richard Holtorf [R]Rep. Alex Valdez [D]
Sen. Jeff Bridges [D]Sen. Janet Buckner [D]Sen. James Coleman [D]Sen. John Cooke [R]
Sen. Donald Coram [R]Sen. Jessie Danielson [D]Sen. Kerry Donovan [D]Sen. Stephen Fenberg [D]
Sen. Rhonda Fields [D]Sen. Leroy Garcia [D]Sen. Bob Gardner [R]Sen. Joann Ginal [D]
Sen. Julie Gonzales [D]Sen. Chris Hansen [D]Sen. Dennis Hisey [R]Sen. Chris Holbert [R]
Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D]Sen. Barbara Kirkmeyer [R]Sen. Chris Kolker [D]Sen. Pete Lee [D]
Sen. Larry Liston [R]Sen. Paul Lundeen [R]Sen. Dominick Moreno [D]Sen. Brittany Pettersen [D]
Sen. Robert Rankin [R]Sen. Ray Scott [R]Sen. Cleave Simpson [R]Sen. Jim Smallwood [R]
Sen. Jerry Sonnenberg [R]Sen. Tammy Story [D]Sen. Faith Winter [D]Sen. Rob Woodward [R]
Sen. Rachel Zenzinger [D]Rep. Judith Amabile [D]Rep. Jennifer Arndt [D]Rep. Jennifer Bacon [D]
Rep. Mark Baisley [R]Rep. Adrienne Benavidez [D]Rep. Tracey Bernett [D]Rep. Shannon Bird [D]
Rep. Rod Bockenfeld [R]Rep. Mary Bradfield [R]Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D]Rep. Terri Carver [R]
Rep. Marc Catlin [R]Rep. Lisa Cutter [D]Rep. Lindsey Daugherty [D]Rep. Monica Duran [D]
Rep. Daneya Esgar [D]Rep. Thomas Exum [D]Rep. Meg Froelich [D]Rep. Alec Garnett [D]
Rep. Tim Geitner [R]Rep. Serena Gonzales-Gutierrez [D]Rep. Matt Gray [D]Rep. Ron Hanks [R]
Rep. Leslie Herod [D]Rep. Edith Hooton [D]Rep. Iman Jodeh [D]Rep. Chris Kennedy [D]
Rep. Cathy Kipp [D]Rep. Colin Larson [R]Rep. Susan Lontine [D]Rep. Stephanie Luck [R]
Rep. Michael Lynch [R]Rep. Julie McCluskie [D]Rep. Karen McCormick [D]Rep. Hugh McKean [R]
Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D]Rep. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D]Rep. Kyle Mullica [D]Rep. Patrick Neville [R]
Rep. David Ortiz [D]Rep. Rod Pelton [R]Rep. Andres Pico [R]Rep. Kim Ransom [R]
Rep. Janice Rich [R]Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D]Rep. Dylan Roberts [D]Rep. Shane Sandridge [R]
Rep. Emily Sirota [D]Rep. Marc Snyder [D]Rep. Matt Soper [R]Rep. Tom Sullivan [D]
Rep. Kerry Tipper [D]Rep. Brianna Titone [D]Rep. Donald Valdez [D]Rep. Tonya Van Beber [R]
Rep. Kevin Van Winkle [R]Rep. Michael Weissman [D]Rep. Perry Will [R]Rep. Dave Williams [R]
Rep. Steven Woodrow [D]Rep. Dan Woog [R]Rep. Mary Young [D]

Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-04-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to
2021-04-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-31SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/05/2021 - No Amendments
2021-03-31SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback