CO SJR014 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the recognition of Alpha Day in remembrance of Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognize MLK Assassination Day

Sponsors

Sen. James Coleman [D]Rep. Thomas Exum [D]Sen. Jeff Bridges [D]Sen. Janet Buckner [D]
Sen. John Cooke [R]Sen. Donald Coram [R]Sen. Jessie Danielson [D]Sen. Kerry Donovan [D]
Sen. Stephen Fenberg [D]Sen. Rhonda Fields [D]Sen. Leroy Garcia [D]Sen. Bob Gardner [R]
Sen. Joann Ginal [D]Sen. Julie Gonzales [D]Sen. Chris Hansen [D]Sen. Dennis Hisey [R]
Sen. Chris Holbert [R]Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D]Sen. Barbara Kirkmeyer [R]Sen. Chris Kolker [D]
Sen. Pete Lee [D]Sen. Larry Liston [R]Sen. Paul Lundeen [R]Sen. Dominick Moreno [D]
Sen. Brittany Pettersen [D]Sen. Kevin Priola [R]Sen. Robert Rankin [R]Sen. Robert Rodriguez [D]
Sen. Ray Scott [R]Sen. Cleave Simpson [R]Sen. Jim Smallwood [R]Sen. Jerry Sonnenberg [R]
Sen. Tammy Story [D]Sen. Faith Winter [D]Sen. Rob Woodward [R]Sen. Rachel Zenzinger [D]
Rep. Judith Amabile [D]Rep. Jennifer Arndt [D]Rep. Jennifer Bacon [D]Rep. Mark Baisley [R]
Rep. Adrienne Benavidez [D]Rep. Tracey Bernett [D]Rep. Rod Bockenfeld [R]Rep. Mary Bradfield [R]
Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D]Rep. Terri Carver [R]Rep. Marc Catlin [R]Rep. Lisa Cutter [D]
Rep. Lindsey Daugherty [D]Rep. Monica Duran [D]Rep. Daneya Esgar [D]Rep. Meg Froelich [D]
Rep. Alec Garnett [D]Rep. Tim Geitner [R]Rep. Serena Gonzales-Gutierrez [D]Rep. Matt Gray [D]
Rep. Ron Hanks [R]Rep. Leslie Herod [D]Rep. Richard Holtorf [R]Rep. Iman Jodeh [D]
Rep. Chris Kennedy [D]Rep. Cathy Kipp [D]Rep. Colin Larson [R]Rep. Susan Lontine [D]
Rep. Stephanie Luck [R]Rep. Michael Lynch [R]Rep. Julie McCluskie [D]Rep. Karen McCormick [D]
Rep. Hugh McKean [R]Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D]Rep. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D]Rep. Kyle Mullica [D]
Rep. Patrick Neville [R]Rep. David Ortiz [D]Rep. Rod Pelton [R]Rep. Andres Pico [R]
Rep. Kim Ransom [R]Rep. Janice Rich [R]Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D]Rep. Dylan Roberts [D]
Rep. Shane Sandridge [R]Rep. Emily Sirota [D]Rep. Matt Soper [R]Rep. Tom Sullivan [D]
Rep. Kerry Tipper [D]Rep. Brianna Titone [D]Rep. Alex Valdez [D]Rep. Donald Valdez [D]
Rep. Tonya Van Beber [R]Rep. Kevin Van Winkle [R]Rep. Michael Weissman [D]Rep. Perry Will [R]
Rep. Dave Williams [R]Rep. Steven Woodrow [D]Rep. Dan Woog [R]Rep. Mary Young [D]

Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-04-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-06HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to
2021-04-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-31SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/06/2021 - No Amendments
2021-03-31SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback