CO SJR013 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the encouragement of stakeholder input with subsequent legislative review prior to the implementation of additional nutrient discharge controls.
Title
Public Input And General Assembly Review Before New Nutrient Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer SJR17-013 to the Full House of Representatives. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer SJR17-013, as amended, to the Full Senate. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer SJR17-013, as amended, to the Full Senate. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 05/09/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/24/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |