CO SJR012 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-37)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-37)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning designating Colorado State Highway 115 from Mile Marker 15 to Mile Marker 27 as the "Veterans of Foreign Wars Warriors Memorial Highway".
Title
Rename Section Of Route 115
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 05/03/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/21/2022 - No Amendments |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |