CO SJR012 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the appointment of a joint committee to notify the governor that the second regular session of the seventy-first general assembly is about to adjourn sine die.
Title
Concerning the appointment of a joint committee to notify the governor that the second regular session of the seventy-first general assembly is about to adjourn sine die.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Holbert [R] | Rep. KC Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Res (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |