CO SJR012 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning recognizing the achievements of Rocky Vista University.
Title
Recognizing Rocky Vista University
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/12/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/21/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |