CO SJR011 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of the portion of Colorado State Highway 50 from the town of Swink to the city of La Junta as the "SSG Brian Cowdrey Memorial Highway".
Title
Designate SSG Brian Cowdrey Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Res (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/09/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |