CO SJR010 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - House Third Reading Passed
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - House Third Reading Passed
Summary
National School Counseling Week
Title
National School Counseling Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/12/2013 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/6C5A0129CB686CDE87257AFC006EA4A4?Open |