CO SJR009 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fibroid Awareness Month
Title
Fibroid Awareness Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/20/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/17/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |