CO SJR005 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-25 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-25 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning national news literacy week.
Title
News Literacy Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/09/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 01/25/2024 - No Amendments |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sjr24-005 |
Text | https://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/2024a_sjr005_01.pdf |