CO SJR004 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
Summary
Ed Cmt Oversight Of State Land Board
Title
Ed Cmt Oversight Of State Land Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-004 to the full Senate for consideration (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-004 to the full Senate for consideration (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-004 to the full Senate for consideration (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-004 to the full Senate for consideration (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-004 to the full Senate for consideration (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-03 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2011-01-25 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-01-20 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-14 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |