CO SJR003 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning approval of water project revolving fund eligibility lists administered by the Colorado water resources and power development authority.
Title
Water Projects Eligibility Lists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Referred to Full House for final action. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Referred to Full Senate for final action and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Referred to Full House for final action. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Referred to Full Senate for final action and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-21 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |