CO SJR003 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-29 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-29 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
FY 2010-2011 Revenue Resolution
Title
FY 2010-2011 Revenue Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Joint Resolution 10-003 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SJR10-003 to the full Senate for final action (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SJR10-003 to the full Senate for final action (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-29 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-01-29 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-01-29 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-28 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-01-26 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance | |
2010-01-22 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-19 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |