CO SJR001 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-22)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the Officers and Employees of the Second Regular Session of the Seventy-third General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Assembly Positions And Salary Ranges

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-14 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2022-01-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2022-01-14HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2022-01-13HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to
2022-01-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2022-01-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback