CO SJM006 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the transfer of federal transportation funding to the state.
Title
Federal Fuel Tax Revenue To State For Transportation Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone SJM17-006 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone SJM17-006 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Memorial (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone SJM17-006 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Memorial (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |