CO SJM002 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializing former Colorado Senator Maynard Yost.
Title
Memorialize Senator Maynard Yost
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Memorials Memorial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-02-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/20/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |