CO SJM002 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - House Third Reading Lay on the Table-Deemed Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - House Third Reading Lay on the Table-Deemed Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Iran International Agreement
Title
Iran International Agreement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Lay on the Table-Deemed Lost - No Amendments |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/24/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |