CO SJM001 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializing former Senator Kathy Arnold.
Title
Memorialize Former Senator Kathy Arnold
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - House - House: MEMORIALS Mem (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Memorials Memorial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Memorials Memorial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-01-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 01/13/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |