CO SCR001 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Submitting to the registered electors of the state of Colorado an amendment to the Colorado constitution to repeal the requirement that the general assembly periodically change the residential assessment rate in order to maintain the statewide proportion of residential property as compared to all other taxable property valued for property tax purposes and repeal the nonresidential property tax assessment rate of twenty-nine percent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal Property Tax Assessment Rates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.005) (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer SCR20-001 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Concurrent Resolution (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Concurrent Resolution (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer SCR20-001 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-11HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2020-06-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-08SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-06SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-05SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-04SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-02SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/scr20-001
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_scr001_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_scr001_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_scr001_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_scr001_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_scr001_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_scr001_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3203958a3cc0a65f8725857b00615194-scr20-001-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/scr20-001vote74cdc3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/scr20-001vote748ce9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b64be95e9c6749b987258584004d9b7e-scr20-001-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/scr20-001vote658945
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/scr20-001vote6571a8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/scr20-001vote65a682

Bill Comments

feedback