CO SB304 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of the joint technology committee.
Title
Authority Of The Joint Technology Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-304 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-304, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-304, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-304 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-304, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-304, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |