CO SB301 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Adhere
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Adhere
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning energy-related statutes.
Title
Energy-related Statutes
Sponsors
Sen. Ray Scott [R] | Sen. Vicki Marble [R] | Rep. Lori Saine [R] | Rep. KC Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-301, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-301, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-301 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-301, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-301, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-301, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.003. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.005. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.004. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.014. (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-301, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.010. (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.008. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.013. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.011. (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-301, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-301, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-301 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-301, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-301, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-301, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.003. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.005. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.004. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.014. (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-301, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.010. (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.008. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.013. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.011. (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-301, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Adhere |
2017-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-05-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-09 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-05-09 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance |
2017-05-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Finance |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |