CO SB299 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the apportionment of income for state income tax for taxpayers with enterprise data centers in the state.
Title
Apportionment Of Income Of Enterprise Data Centers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-299 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-299 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-299 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-299, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-299, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-299 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-299 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-299, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-299, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/09/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-04 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-05-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |