CO SB298 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the relationship between a motor vehicle manufacturer and the motor vehicle dealers that have franchise agreements with the manufacturer.
Title
Motor Vehicle Dealers And Manufacturers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-298, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-298, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-298, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.015. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.013. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.016. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.017, as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-298, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.019. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.018. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-298, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-298, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-298, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-298, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.015. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.013. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.016. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.017, as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-298, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.019. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.018. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-298, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-05-04 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |