CO SB292 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-11)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-11)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the allocation of fifteen million dollars from the economic relief and recovery cash fund under the federal "American Rescue Plan Act of 2021" for purpose of funding victim's services programs to assist persons disproportionately impacted by the COVID-19 public health emergency, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Federal COVID Funding For Victim's Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.011) (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-292, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.008) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-292, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-292 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.011) (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-292, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.008) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-292, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-292 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-04 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-06-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-06-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |