CO SB290 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-9)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-9)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the allocation of fifteen million dollars from the general fund to establish the area agency on aging grant program for programs providing assistance to older Coloradans, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Security For Colorado Seniors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-290 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-290 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-290 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-290 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-290 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-290 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-06-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |