CO SB288 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Compensation Of State & County Public Officials
Title
Compensation Of State & County Public Officials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Motion to Reconsider "Motion to Refer Senate Bill 15-288 to the Committee of the Whole" The motion passed on a vote of 10-1. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-288 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-288 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-288 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-288 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-288, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-288 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-288 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-288 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-288 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-288, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-05-05 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-05-05 | House | House Committee on Finance Reconsider to Finance |
2015-05-05 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |