CO SB284 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the 'Women's Reproductive Information Guarantee for Health and Transparency (RIGHT) Act'.
Title
A Woman's Right To Accurate Health Care Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-284, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment I). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-284 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment L). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment K). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment J). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-284 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-284, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment I). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-284 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment L). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment K). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment J). (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-284 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |