CO SB282 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of "Jury Appreciation Day".
Title
Jury Appreciation Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-282 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-282 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-282 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 23-282 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |