CO SB282 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an extension of the small retailer exception to the sales and use tax destination sourcing rules.
Title
Continue Small Business Destination Sourcing Exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-282 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-282 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-282 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-282 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-06-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |