CO SB282 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Jump-start Prog Econ Dev Distressed Counties
Title
Jump-start Prog Econ Dev Distressed Counties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-282 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-282 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-282, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-282 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-282 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-282, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-282 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-282, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-282 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-282 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-282, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-05-05 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |