CO SB278 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allow Dome Restoration Moneys For Cap Restoration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow Dome Restoration Moneys For Cap Restoration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-278 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-278 to the Committee of the Whole. Recommend consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateGovernor Signed
2015-05-14SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-14SenateSent to the Governor
2015-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-29HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2015-04-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-28SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-04-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7478419F4A2E94F287257E2F0052358E?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7478419F4A2E94F287257E2F0052358E/$FILE/278_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7478419F4A2E94F287257E2F0052358E/$FILE/278_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7478419F4A2E94F287257E2F0052358E/$FILE/278_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7478419F4A2E94F287257E2F0052358E/$FILE/278_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7478419F4A2E94F287257E2F0052358E/$FILE/278_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7478419F4A2E94F287257E2F0052358E/$FILE/278_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7E278B56742C0E2C87257E35004FB3F4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8F681ED39969C39087257E380054A252

Bill Comments

feedback