CO SB276 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Voter Approval For Use Of Red Light Cameras

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Approval For Use Of Red Light Cameras

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). A substitute amendment, L.006, was moved and passed (see vote sheet below). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment E) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-276, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment page 4, line 6, insert "SOME" before "RESEARCH"; line 12, insert "SOME" before "COLORADANS" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-276, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-03SenateGovernor Vetoed
2015-05-18SenateSent to the Governor
2015-05-18SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-06SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-05-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-05-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-05-05HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-05-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2015-05-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-04-28SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-04-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4BD25C225FB002487257DF000559A8C?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4BD25C225FB002487257DF000559A8C/$FILE/276_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4BD25C225FB002487257DF000559A8C/$FILE/276sblt_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4BD25C225FB002487257DF000559A8C/$FILE/276_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4BD25C225FB002487257DF000559A8C/$FILE/276_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4BD25C225FB002487257DF000559A8C/$FILE/276te_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4BD25C225FB002487257DF000559A8C/$FILE/276_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4BD25C225FB002487257DF000559A8C/$FILE/276_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A4BD25C225FB002487257DF000559A8C/$FILE/276_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/250038B9656D1E0887257E3500628E78
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C1DBE4C67E40077887257E3C0067E6B7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/771F4E9D4126E49787257E35006170A2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6C598D7446AC043187257E350060846C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/93242F4E8562EA8E87257E3C0067069C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5EE456DD7CBE7A1487257E4400634724
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/30940749A19049CE87257E3C00665AE0

Bill Comments

feedback