CO SB271 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-7)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-7)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the adoption of the 2021 recommendations of the Colorado criminal and juvenile justice commission regarding sentencing for offenses, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Misdemeanor Reform
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-271 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-271 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.007) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-271, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-271, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-271, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-271, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-271 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-271 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.007) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-271, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-271, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-271, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-271, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-07 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-06-03 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |