CO SB270 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - House Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - House Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pub Safety Officers Collect For Charity
Title
Pub Safety Officers Collect For Charity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-270 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-270 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-270 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-270 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-270 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | House Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-05-10 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-06 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-29 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |