CO SB269 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-7)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning licensing respite child care centers, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing Of Respite Child Care Centers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-269 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-269, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-269 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-23HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-07HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-04HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-06-03HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-28HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2021-05-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-24SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-269
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_269_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_269_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_269_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_269_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_269_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_269_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB269_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb269_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0269_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d1c9a06b2ca9e9e1872586df00724ec2-sb21-269-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f8cd1f43fa59a76d872586e100545da8-sb21-269-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f8cd1f43fa59a76d872586e100545da8-sb21-269-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-269vote554f2c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-269vote5424c9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7ab02df6de492d4f872586e900786f90-sb21-269-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-269vote0b762e

Bill Comments 750

feedback