CO SB269 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the exclusion of specified nonalcohol products from the calculation of the maximum amount of a retail liquor store's annual gross sales revenue that may be derived from the sale of nonalcohol products.
Title
Retail Liquor Store Sales Revenue Nonalcohol Goods
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-269 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-269, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-269, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-269 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-269, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-269, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-25 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |