CO SB267 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sustainability of rural Colorado.
Title
Sustainability Of Rural Colorado
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Amendment L.032 (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-267 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-267 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.027 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.023 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment J). (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-267, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt a conceptual amendment that strikes "of" and substitutes "for" on page 51, lines 18, 20, and 27. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment K). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-267, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-267 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-267 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.027 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.023 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment J). (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-267, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt a conceptual amendment that strikes "of" and substitutes "for" on page 51, lines 18, 20, and 27. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment K). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-267, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/09/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-08 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-05-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |