CO SB267 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School Finance
Title
School Finance
Sponsors
Sen. Owen Hill [R] | Rep. Millie Hamner [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.026 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.019 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.024 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.025 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-267, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Conceptual amendment to SB 15-267 to eliminate minimum state aid, include an appropriation clause for $25.0 million General Fund, and include lines 7-25 from J.001 as a footnote on ASCENT funding (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-267 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.026 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.019 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.024 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.025 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-267, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Conceptual amendment to SB 15-267 to eliminate minimum state aid, include an appropriation clause for $25.0 million General Fund, and include lines 7-25 from J.001 as a footnote on ASCENT funding (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-267 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-27 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |