CO SB265 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-19)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-19)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a transfer from the general fund to the state highway fund.
Title
Transfer From General Fund To State Highway Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-265 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-265 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-265 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-265 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |