CO SB265 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Vehicle Dealer Franchise Agreements
Title
Motor Vehicle Dealer Franchise Agreements
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Kerr [D] | Sen. Chris Holbert [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-265 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 1 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 1 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-265 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-265 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-265 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 1 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 1 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-265 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-265 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-265 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-03 | Senate | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered |
2013-04-30 | House | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |