CO SB261 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning adding a condition for which a physician could prescribe an opiate for pain to the list of disabling medical conditions for medical marijuana use.
Title
Medical Marijuana Condition Opiates Prescribed For
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-261 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-261 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |