CO SB260 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning access to publicly funded vaccines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual Access To Publicly Funded Vaccines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-260 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment I). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment K). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment J). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment H). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-10 Governor Signed
2023-05-09 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-05-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-27HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-04-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-04-18HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services
2023-04-18SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-17SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2023-04-13SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-03-31SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb23-260
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_260_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_260_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_260_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_260_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_260_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_260_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/151F163585EC7BDA872589910003956B/SB260_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/5F24068FC5C231AA87258990000ACEA4/SB260_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/C0BC6CDD691D76BE872589910060CB7C/SB260_L.008.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/25BD1A97A750466E87258991000ACF97/SB260_L.016.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/227C294D90EA1D9F872589910003A89C/SB260_L.011.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/42C5E3C83C42E6BB872589910003AEF6/SB260_L.015.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb260_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb260_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb260_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e3c9b6fcb86eb76b87258991000d6175-sb23-260-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-260vote555c30
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a8e076c72ddc07ab8725899c00759b80-sb23-260-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-260vote53873e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e3c9b6fcb86eb76b87258991000d6175-sb23-260-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e3c9b6fcb86eb76b87258991000d6175-sb23-260-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e3c9b6fcb86eb76b87258991000d6175-sb23-260-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e3c9b6fcb86eb76b87258991000d6175-sb23-260-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e3c9b6fcb86eb76b87258991000d6175-sb23-260-5-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback