CO SB256 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
CO Health Insurance Exchange Oversight Committee
Title
CO Health Insurance Exchange Oversight Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-256, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-256, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-256 to the Legislative Council Committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-256, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-256 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-256, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-256, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-256 to the Legislative Council Committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-256, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-256 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-24 | House | House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-04-21 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to Legislative Council |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |