CO SB255 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the provision of compensation to people who suffer damages because of gray wolf depredation, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wolf Depredation Compensation Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-255 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 23-255, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 23-255, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-23 Governor Signed
2023-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-05-09HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-05-04SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2023-05-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-05-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2023-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-04-27HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2023-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-04-24HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
2023-04-17HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources
2023-04-17SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-14SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2023-04-14SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-03-30SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
2023-03-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb23-255
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_255_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_255_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_255_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_255_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_255_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_255_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/71668457053D55088725898200563009/SB255_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/D170DBF3B7EF283C8725898200605C89/SB255_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/3C9BE93A045A0957872589900072B9DC/SB255_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/E20CB035149132608725898A00689D9C/SB255_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/601D35BA40B960EF872589910050242C/SB255_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/352BE3ED7BBFF5B18725899B005B5B25/SB255_L.009.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/6853BE814E92F0FD8725899E0056742A/SB255_L.012.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/BD6B44F422D6C1F58725899F006219D8/SB255_L.013.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb255_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb255_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb0255_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb255_r2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb0255_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb255_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7f379134a3d3a0c287258982006fab5c-sb23-255-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/833b2c10d8a111278725899100513fc9-sb23-255-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/833b2c10d8a111278725899100513fc9-sb23-255-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/833b2c10d8a111278725899100513fc9-sb23-255-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/833b2c10d8a111278725899100513fc9-sb23-255-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-255vote5b2339
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8789dc937dbe42348725899b00733655-sb23-255-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0aeac2f2bffab1b18725899c004c7c2f-sb23-255-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7f379134a3d3a0c287258982006fab5c-sb23-255-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7f379134a3d3a0c287258982006fab5c-sb23-255-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8789dc937dbe42348725899b00733655-sb23-255-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-255vote010c39
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-255vote77246e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-255vote7730e6

Bill Comments

feedback