CO SB252 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-6)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning hospital medical price transparency.
Title
Medical Price Transparency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-252 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.004) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-252, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-252 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.004) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 23-252, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |