CO SB252 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-5)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-5)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the establishment of a state grant program to promote projects in commercial centers throughout the state that will revitalize community spaces and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Community Revitalization Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-252, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-252, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-252 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-252 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-252, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-252, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-252, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-252, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-252 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-252 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-252, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-252, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-26 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |