CO SB252 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable Energy Standard Retail Wholesale Methane
Title
Renewable Energy Standard Retail Wholesale Methane
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-252 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.033 (Attachment J) (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.032 (Attachment I) (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.031 (Attachment H) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.033 (Attachment J) (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.032 (Attachment I) (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.031 (Attachment H) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-252 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-252, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.009 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-252, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.009 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-252, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-252, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.033 (Attachment J) (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.032 (Attachment I) (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.031 (Attachment H) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.033 (Attachment J) (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.032 (Attachment I) (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.031 (Attachment H) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-252 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-252, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.009 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-252, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.009 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-252, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-252, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over with Amendments |
2013-04-24 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |