CO SB251 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a loan from the general fund to the division of family and medical leave insurance for the purpose of implementing the state's paid family and medical leave program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
General Fund Loan Family Medical Leave Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-251 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-251 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-251, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-251, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-251 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-251 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-251 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-251, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-251, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-251 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-27 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |