CO SB249 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-5)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of an optional discounted parks and public lands access pass that is purchased at the time a motor vehicle is registered, and, in connection therewith, using the pass fees to finance a number of goals of the division of parks and wildlife related to increased conservation of, safety at, and access to state parks and public lands; and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Keep Colorado Wild Annual Pass

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-249 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 21-249 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-249 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-249 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21 Governor Signed
2021-06-15 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-03SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-02HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-06-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-06-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-28HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-27HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Finance
2021-05-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment
2021-05-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-14SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-12SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-06SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Finance
2021-05-06SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-04-23SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-249
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_249_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_249_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_249_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_249_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_249_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_249_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB249_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB249_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB249_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB249_J.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB249_L.007.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb249_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0249_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb249_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0249_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/94d5f761cd6121ad872586cd006f942f-sb21-249-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/447fdf7a58786ef0872586d3007cad26-sb21-249-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/202b6e411eee7320872586d500506471-sb21-249-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/202b6e411eee7320872586d500506471-sb21-249-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-249vote5bff28
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fd72833ee46e3865872586e30005a30e-sb21-249-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ae5a38d3d7952eba872586e30081b315-sb21-249-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2c1b9310f0e064db872586e7004fe6f4-sb21-249-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2c1b9310f0e064db872586e7004fe6f4-sb21-249-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-249vote70a691
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-249vote0fd22d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-249vote0fe840

Bill Comments 750

feedback