CO SB248 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-12)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning assistance for agriculture in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, establishing a loan program in the department of agriculture, transferring money from the general fund to a new agricultural future loan program cash fund to be used for the loan program, and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Loan Program For Colorado Agriculture

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 21-248, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment B). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 21-248, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-248, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-248, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 21-248, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29 Governor Signed
2021-06-15 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-08HouseHouse Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2021-06-08SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2021-06-07 First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
2021-06-03SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2021-06-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-02HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-06-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-06-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-27HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water
2021-05-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-14SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-05SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-21SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-248
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_248_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_248_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_248_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_248_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_248_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_248_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB248_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB248_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB248_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB248_L.010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB248_L.011.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB248_L.013.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB248_L.014.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb248_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0248_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb248_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0248_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3ec29dc85cb2f15e872586cc005d1976-sb21-248-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/466e1a4bc6c08836872586d5004fdaa8-sb21-248-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/466e1a4bc6c08836872586d5004fdaa8-sb21-248-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-248vote66f9a8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-248vote5a811a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1a642e118f4073ce872586e200650173-sb21-248-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/989413d443e6b390872586e7004fc0c4-sb21-248-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/989413d443e6b390872586e7004fc0c4-sb21-248-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1a642e118f4073ce872586e200650173-sb21-248-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1a642e118f4073ce872586e200650173-sb21-248-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-248vote70ee2e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3ec29dc85cb2f15e872586cc005d1976-sb21-248-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-248vote0fb253
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-248vote575c79
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-248vote57720e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-248vote6622f7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-248vote663232

Bill Comments 750

feedback